MI HB4959 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of committing a moving violation causing death of vulnerable roadway user; provide for. Amends sec. 12e, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.12e). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4958'09
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of committing a moving violation causing death of vulnerable roadway user; provide for. Amends sec. 12e, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.12e). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4958'09
Sponsors
Rep. Vicki Barnett [D] | Rep. Joan Bauer [D] | Rep. Lisa Brown [D] | Rep. Andy Coulouris [D] |
Rep. Fred Durhal [D] | Rep. Douglas Geiss [D] | Rep. Robert Jones [D] | Rep. Gabe Leland [D] |
Rep. Lesia Liss [D] | Rep. Mark Meadows [D] | Rep. Judy Nerat [D] | Rep. Sarah Roberts [D] |
Rep. Dian Slavens [D] | Rep. Mary Valentine [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-09-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-10 | Referred To Committee On Transportation | |
2010-11-09 | Transmitted | |
2010-11-09 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 450 Yeas 73 Nays 30 | |
2010-11-09 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-11-09 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-11-09 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-11-09 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2010-11-09 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-09-22 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-09-22 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-05-20 | Printed Bill Filed 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Referred To Committee On Transportation | |
2009-05-19 | Read A First Time | |
2009-05-19 | Introduced By Representative Gabe Leland |