MI HB4959 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-03 - Assigned Pa 125'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Liquor; distribution; wholesaler residency requirements; modify, and provide for inspection and seizure procedures. Amends sec. 601 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1601).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liquor; distribution; wholesaler residency requirements; modify, and provide for inspection and seizure procedures. Amends sec. 601 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1601).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 297 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 296 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 296 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 259 (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-03HouseAssigned Pa 125'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-12-03HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 11/21/2019 04:06 Pm
2019-12-03HouseApproved By The Governor 11/21/2019 10:35 Am
2019-11-20HousePresented To The Governor 11/12/2019 12:41 Pm
2019-11-06HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-11-06HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-11-06HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2019-11-06SenateInserted Full Title
2019-11-06SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 297 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2019-11-06SenateVote Reconsidered
2019-11-06SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 296 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2019-11-06SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-11-06SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-10-30SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-10-30SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-10-30SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-10-15SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2019-10-10HouseTransmitted
2019-10-10HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 259 Yeas 101 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2019-10-10HouseRead A Third Time
2019-10-08HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-10-08HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2019-10-08HouseRead A Second Time
2019-10-08HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-10-08HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2019-10-03HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
2019-09-17HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/17/2019
2019-09-12HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2019-09-12HouseRead A First Time
2019-09-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Roger Hauck

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4959
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4959.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4959.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4959.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0125.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-10-08-094.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-10-10-095.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-10-30-103.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-11-06-106.htm

Bill Comments

feedback