MI HB4978 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-16)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children; foster care; information regarding the foster children's assurance of quality foster care policy; require the department of human services to provide to foster children. Amends 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.951 - 722.960) by adding sec. 8d. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4976'15, HB 4977'15
Title
Children; foster care; information regarding the foster children's assurance of quality foster care policy; require the department of human services to provide to foster children. Amends 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.951 - 722.960) by adding sec. 8d. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4976'15, HB 4977'15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 261 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 261 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2016-05-12 | House | Transmitted |
2016-05-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 261 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2016-05-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-05-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-05-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-10-14 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/14/2015 |
2015-10-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2015-10-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-10-13 | House | Introduced By Representative George Darany |