MI HB5024 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 272'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 272'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Townships: other; townships to levy a millage for mosquito abatement; authorize. Amends 1846 RS 16 (MCL 41.1a - 41.110c) by adding sec. 4a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5025'19, HB 5025'19
Title
Townships: other; townships to levy a millage for mosquito abatement; authorize. Amends 1846 RS 16 (MCL 41.1a - 41.110c) by adding sec. 4a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5025'19, HB 5025'19
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Sneller [D] | Rep. Gary Howell [R] | Rep. Donna Lasinski [D] | Sen. John Cherry [D] |
Rep. Terry Sabo [D] | Rep. Rachel Hood [D] | Rep. Ronnie Peterson [D] | Rep. Sheryl Kennedy [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 599 (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 182 (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 167 (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 182 (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 167 (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 272'20 |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 01:16 Pm |
2020-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/29/2020 09:26 Am |
2020-12-21 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 06:59 Pm |
2020-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 599 Yeas 30 Nays 7 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2020-03-17 | House | Transmitted |
2020-03-17 | House | Passed Roll Call # 182 Yeas 72 Nays 21 Excused 0 Not Voting 17 |
2020-03-17 | House | Vote Reconsidered |
2020-03-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 167 Yeas 72 Nays 19 Excused 0 Not Voting 19 |
2020-03-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-03-17 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-09-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/26/2019 |
2019-09-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2019-09-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-09-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Tim Sneller |