MI HB5100 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate income tax: credits; research and development credit for certain large employers; provide for. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.847) by adding secs. 277 & 677.
Title
Corporate income tax: credits; research and development credit for certain large employers; provide for. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.847) by adding secs. 277 & 677.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 83 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 428 (Y: 79 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 428 (Y: 79 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2024-04-10 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 83 Yeas 22 Nays 13 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-11-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-11-01 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-10-31 | House | Transmitted |
2023-10-31 | House | Title Amended |
2023-10-31 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 428 Yeas 79 Nays 31 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-10-31 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-10-31 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-10-31 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted And Amended |
2023-10-31 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-10-31 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-10-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/05/2023 |
2023-10-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business |
2023-10-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Jasper Martus |
Subjects
Corporate income tax: credits
Economic development: Michigan strategic fund
Individual income tax: credit
Economic development: Michigan strategic fund
Individual income tax: credit