MI HB5119 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-9)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Family law; domestic violence; reference of family independence agency; revise to department of health and human services. Amends title & sec. 1 of 1978 PA 389 (MCL 400.1501).
Title
Family law; domestic violence; reference of family independence agency; revise to department of health and human services. Amends title & sec. 1 of 1978 PA 389 (MCL 400.1501).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 149 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 149 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2016-04-12 | House | Transmitted |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 149 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2016-04-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-03-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-03-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-12-08 | House | Printed Bill Filed 12/04/2015 |
2015-12-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2015-12-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-12-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Sheldon Neeley |
Subjects
Family law: domestic violence
State agencies (existing): community health
State agencies (existing): human services
State agencies (existing): community health
State agencies (existing): human services