MI HB5153 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-16 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-16 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children: child abuse or child neglect; definition of neglect in the child abuse and neglect prevention act; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 1982 PA 250 (MCL 722.602).
Title
Children: child abuse or child neglect; definition of neglect in the child abuse and neglect prevention act; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 1982 PA 250 (MCL 722.602).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 375 (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans |
2020-09-15 | House | Transmitted |
2020-09-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 375 Yeas 99 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-09-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-06-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-06-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-10-29 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/29/2019 |
2019-10-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2019-10-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Annette Glenn |