MI HB5380 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Legislature; other; qualifications, appointment, and duties of delegates to an article V convention; provide for. Creates new act.
Title
Legislature; other; qualifications, appointment, and duties of delegates to an article V convention; provide for. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Franz [R] | Rep. Robert Genetski [R] | Rep. Gregory MacMaster [R] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] |
Rep. Pat Somerville [R] | Rep. Ken Goike [R] | Sen. Jon Bumstead [R] | Rep. Anthony Forlini [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 763 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 151 (Y: 62 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 151 (Y: 62 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-30 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 12/26/2014 |
2014-12-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/15/2014 @ 3:34 Pm |
2014-12-11 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-11 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 763 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2014-03-20 | House | Transmitted |
2014-03-20 | House | Title Amended |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 151 Yeas 62 Nays 47 |
2014-03-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-03-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2014-03-05 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/05/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Liability Reform |
2014-03-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Ray Franz |