MI HB5385 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Postponed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Postponed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; speed restrictions; procedure for establishing certain speed limits; modify, and make other revisions. Amends secs. 627 & 628 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.627 & 257.628).
Title
Traffic control; speed restrictions; procedure for establishing certain speed limits; modify, and make other revisions. Amends secs. 627 & 628 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.627 & 257.628).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 1039 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 684 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 684 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2018-12-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-12-21 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Full Title |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 1039 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-12-05 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-05 | House | Title Amended |
2018-12-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 684 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-12-04 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-01-11 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/10/2018 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-01-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Holly Hughes |
Subjects
State agencies (existing): transportation
Traffic control: speed restrictions
Traffic control: traffic regulation
Traffic control: speed restrictions
Traffic control: traffic regulation