MI HB5439 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 547'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 547'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Agriculture; other; industrial hemp; authorize research. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5440'14
Title
Agriculture; other; industrial hemp; authorize research. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5440'14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 846 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 297 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 297 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 547'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/15/2015 @ 11:29 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 3:22 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/5/2015 @ 4:02 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-17 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 846 Yeas 27 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2014-05-22 | House | Transmitted |
2014-05-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 297 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2014-05-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-05-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-04-17 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/28/2014 |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2014-03-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-03-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Daley |