MI HB5481 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-21 - Assigned Pa 250'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-21 - Assigned Pa 250'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations: appraisers; appraisal management company requirements; modify. Amends secs. 2661, 2663, 2665, 2667, 2671, 2673 & 2677 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.2661 et seq.) & adds sec. 2670.
Title
Occupations: appraisers; appraisal management company requirements; modify. Amends secs. 2661, 2663, 2665, 2667, 2671, 2673 & 2677 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.2661 et seq.) & adds sec. 2670.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 443 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 221 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 221 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-21 | House | Assigned Pa 250'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-21 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2020 05:38 Pm |
2020-12-21 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/22/2020 04:30 Pm |
2020-12-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/09/2020 09:05 Am |
2020-12-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled 12/04/2020 |
2020-12-08 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 443 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-06-03 | House | Transmitted |
2020-06-03 | House | Title Amended |
2020-06-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 221 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-05-27 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-05-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-02-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/12/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2020-02-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Diana Farrington |