MI HB5504 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 291'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 291'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Drains: financing; allow for inspection and maintenance, prohibit concurrent assessments, and require sealed bids for nonpetitioned maintenance. Amends secs. 31, 196, 221 & 434 of 1956 PA 40 (MCL 280.31 et seq.).
Title
Drains: financing; allow for inspection and maintenance, prohibit concurrent assessments, and require sealed bids for nonpetitioned maintenance. Amends secs. 31, 196, 221 & 434 of 1956 PA 40 (MCL 280.31 et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. James Lower [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 594 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 552 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 335 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 552 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 335 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 291'20 |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 01:54 Pm |
2020-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/29/2020 10:04 Am |
2020-12-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 05:53 Pm |
2020-12-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-17 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 594 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-12-17 | House | Senate Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2020-12-16 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-12-31 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-3) With Full Title |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 552 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3) |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2020-07-22 | House | Transmitted |
2020-07-22 | House | Title Amended |
2020-07-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 335 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-07-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-07-22 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-07-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-07-22 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-07-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-06-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-06-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-06-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-02-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2020-02-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-02-19 | House | Introduced By Representative James Lower |