MI HB5512 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Assigned Pa 375'14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Assigned Pa 375'14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; services or financial assistance; eligibility for family independence program assistance benefits; deny for certain noncompliance with child support provisions. Amends secs. 57 & 57g of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.57 & 400.57g).
Title
Human services; services or financial assistance; eligibility for family independence program assistance benefits; deny for certain noncompliance with child support provisions. Amends secs. 57 & 57g of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.57 & 400.57g).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 750 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-17 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 469 (Y: 94 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-17 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 469 (Y: 94 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | House | Assigned Pa 375'14 |
2014-12-18 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/17/2014 @ 3:52 Pm |
2014-12-18 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/17/2014 @ 11:54 Am |
2014-12-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/15/2014 @ 3:58 Pm |
2014-12-10 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-10 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-10 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 750 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2014-09-17 | House | Transmitted |
2014-09-17 | House | Passed Roll Call # 469 Yeas 94 Nays 14 |
2014-09-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-09-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-09-10 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-09-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-05-06 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/02/2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2014-05-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-05-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Kenneth Kurtz |