MI HB5546 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; assessments; transfer of ownership from a general or limited partnership to certain individuals; allow to be exempt from uncapping taxes after transfer. Amends sec. 27a of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.27a).
Title
Property tax; assessments; transfer of ownership from a general or limited partnership to certain individuals; allow to be exempt from uncapping taxes after transfer. Amends sec. 27a of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.27a).
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Inman [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/13/2018 |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2018-02-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Larry Inman |