MI HB5570 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 293'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 293'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; portion of M-60; designate as the "Sergeant Matthew R. Soper Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2091) by adding sec. 106.
Title
Highways: memorial; portion of M-60; designate as the "Sergeant Matthew R. Soper Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2091) by adding sec. 106.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 526 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 380 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 380 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 293'20 |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 01:58 Pm |
2020-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/29/2020 10:08 Am |
2020-12-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 05:13 Pm |
2020-12-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 526 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2020-09-15 | House | Transmitted |
2020-09-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 380 Yeas 108 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-09-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-06-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-09-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-03-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/03/2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2020-02-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Alexander |