MI HB5625 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-11 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-11 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health; other; use of mediation as a first step in dispute resolution; allow. Amends sec. 788 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1788).
Title
Mental health; other; use of mediation as a first step in dispute resolution; allow. Amends sec. 788 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1788).
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Durhal [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 721 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-12-06 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 721 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-11-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-02-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/21/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-02-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-02-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Fred Durhal |