MI HB5725 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-04 - Postponed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-04 - Postponed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Property; conveyances; conveyance of surplus state-owned real estate; enact procedures for conveyance. Amends sec. 251 of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1251) & adds sec. 257.
Title
Property; conveyances; conveyance of surplus state-owned real estate; enact procedures for conveyance. Amends sec. 251 of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1251) & adds sec. 257.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Haveman [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-09-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2014-12-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-02 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2014-12-02 | House | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted |
2014-12-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-09-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-09-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2014-09-09 | House | Printed Bill Filed 08/28/2014 |
2014-08-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-08-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-08-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Joe Haveman |
Subjects
Property, conveyances
State agencies (existing), other
State agencies (existing), technology, management, and budget
State agencies (existing), other
State agencies (existing), technology, management, and budget