MI HB5729 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/08/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/08/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of assaulting a developmentally disabled individual; provide for. Amends sec. 16d, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16d). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5728'16
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of assaulting a developmentally disabled individual; provide for. Amends sec. 16d, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16d). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5728'16
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/08/2016 |
2016-06-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2016-06-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-06-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Frank Liberati |
Same As/Similar To
SB1018 (Same As) 2016-08-03 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2016-HB-5729 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billintroduced/House/htm/2016-HIB-5729.htm |