MI HB5778 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 610'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 610'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Agriculture; animals; large carnivore act; amend to allow for breeding of large carnivores in certain situations. Amends secs. 2, 3 & 22 of 2000 PA 274 (MCL 287.1102 et seq.) & adds secs. 22a, 22b & 22c.
Title
Agriculture; animals; large carnivore act; amend to allow for breeding of large carnivores in certain situations. Amends secs. 2, 3 & 22 of 2000 PA 274 (MCL 287.1102 et seq.) & adds secs. 22a, 22b & 22c.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 955 (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 899 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 472 (Y: 55 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 899 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 472 (Y: 55 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 610'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 5:32 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 4:03 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 6:18 Pm |
2018-12-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | House | Roll Call # 955 Yeas 60 Nays 48 |
2018-12-20 | House | Senate Substitute S-4 Concurred In |
2018-12-20 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-12-20 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-4 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 899 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-4 |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Substitute S-4 Concurred In |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-4 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2018-06-12 | House | Transmitted |
2018-06-12 | House | Title Amended |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 472 Yeas 55 Nays 54 |
2018-06-12 | House | Amended |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-06-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Substitute H-5 Adopted |
2018-06-07 | House | Substitute H-3 Not Adopted |
2018-06-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2018-04-11 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/10/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2018-04-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-04-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Thomas Albert |