MI HB5839 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 486'16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 486'16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of selling or offering to sell travel services for purpose of engaging in what would be prostitution or human trafficking if it occurred in this state; enact. Amends sec. 16w, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16w).
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of selling or offering to sell travel services for purpose of engaging in what would be prostitution or human trafficking if it occurred in this state; enact. Amends sec. 16w, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16w).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 822 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 475 (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 475 (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 486'16 |
2016-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/6/2017 @ 1:16 Pm |
2016-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/5/2017 @ 12:17 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2016 @ 1:02 Pm |
2016-12-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 822 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-09-21 | House | Transmitted |
2016-09-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 475 Yeas 101 Nays 5 |
2016-09-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-09-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-09-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-09-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-09-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-09-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/08/2016 |
2016-09-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2016-09-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-09-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Sheppard |
Subjects
Crimes: business crimes
Crimes: human trafficking
Crimes: prostitution
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines
Crimes: human trafficking
Crimes: prostitution
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines