MI HB5847 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; budget; technical amendments to budget stabilization fund; provide for. Amends secs. 302, 352, 354, 355, 356, 358 & 367b of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1302 et seq.) & repeals secs. 353 & 397 of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.353 & 18.1397).
Title
State financing and management; budget; technical amendments to budget stabilization fund; provide for. Amends secs. 302, 352, 354, 355, 356, 358 & 367b of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1302 et seq.) & repeals secs. 353 & 397 of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.353 & 18.1397).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 515 (Y: 70 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 515 (Y: 70 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2016-11-29 | House | Transmitted |
2016-11-29 | House | Passed Roll Call # 515 Yeas 70 Nays 37 |
2016-11-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-11-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-11-10 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-11-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-09-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-09-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2016-09-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/08/2016 |
2016-09-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2016-09-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-09-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Al Pscholka |