MI HB5852 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment
Pending: Senate Economic Development And International Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment
Pending: Senate Economic Development And International Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; other; reporting and oversight of water resource improvement tax increment financing and certain tax increment financing changes; provide for. Amends secs. 3, 10, 16 & 23 of 2008 PA 94 (MCL 125.1773 et seq.).
Title
Economic development; other; reporting and oversight of water resource improvement tax increment financing and certain tax increment financing changes; provide for. Amends secs. 3, 10, 16 & 23 of 2008 PA 94 (MCL 125.1773 et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Lana Theis [R] | Rep. Lee Chatfield [R] | Rep. Pat Somerville [R] | Rep. Amanda Price [R] |
Rep. David Maturen [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-01 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 539 (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment |
2016-12-01 | House | Transmitted |
2016-12-01 | House | Passed Roll Call # 539 Yeas 60 Nays 48 |
2016-12-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-11-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-11-30 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2016-11-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-09-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-09-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2016-09-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/08/2016 |
2016-09-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2016-09-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-09-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Lana Theis |