MI HB5854 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-04 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-04 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; no-fault; assigned claims; modify various provisions relating to. Amends secs. 102, 3101a, 3171, 3172, 3173, 3173a, 3174, 3175, 3177 & 3178 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.102 et seq.).
Title
Insurance; no-fault; assigned claims; modify various provisions relating to. Amends secs. 102, 3101a, 3171, 3172, 3173, 3173a, 3174, 3175, 3177 & 3178 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.102 et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Lund [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-04 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2014-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2014-09-24 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/24/2014 |
2014-09-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2014-09-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-09-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Pete Lund |