MI HB5885 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-23 - Assigned Pa 162'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-23 - Assigned Pa 162'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; military affairs; department of military and veterans affairs; provide for fiscal year 2010-2011. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations; military affairs; department of military and veterans affairs; provide for fiscal year 2010-2011. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-23 | Assigned Pa 162'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-09-23 | Filed With Secretary Of State 9/23/2010 @ 1:35 Pm | |
2010-09-23 | Approved By The Governor 9/23/2010 @ 9:40 Am | |
2010-09-21 | Presented To The Governor 9/16/2010 @ 3:42 Pm | |
2010-09-15 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-09-15 | Conference Report Adopted By Senate | |
2010-09-15 | Senate Adopted Conference Report Roll Call # 410 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-09-15 | Conference Report Received In Senate | |
2010-09-14 | Retransmitted | |
2010-09-14 | Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 373 Yeas 101 Nays 6 | |
2010-09-14 | Rule Suspended | |
2010-09-14 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | |
2010-09-14 | Conference Report Received | |
2010-06-16 | Referred To Conference Committee 06/15/2010 | |
2010-06-16 | Senate Conferees Named 06/15/2010: Sens. Valde Garcia Alan Cropsey James Barcia | |
2010-06-16 | Senate Named Conferees 06/15/2010: Sens. Valde Garcia, Alan Cropsey, James Barcia | |
2010-06-15 | House Conferees Named 06/11/2010: Reps. Richard Leblanc John Espinoza Bob Genetski | |
2010-05-19 | Roll Call # 205 Yeas 0 Nays 107 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Substitute S-1 Nonconcurred In | |
2010-05-18 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | |
2010-05-18 | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-05-18 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 240 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-05-18 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-05-18 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-05-18 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-05-18 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-05-18 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-05-14 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-05-14 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-05-14 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-04-13 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2010-03-25 | Transmitted | |
2010-03-25 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 128 Yeas 57 Nays 52 | |
2010-03-25 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-03-25 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-03-25 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-03-25 | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended | |
2010-03-25 | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-03-23 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-03-23 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2010-02-24 | Printed Bill Filed 02/24/2010 | |
2010-02-23 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2010-02-23 | Read A First Time | |
2010-02-23 | Introduced By Representative Richard Leblanc |
Same As/Similar To
SB1191 (Same As) 2010-03-03 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations