MI HB5901 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-12 - Printed Bill Filed 11/07/2014
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-12 - Printed Bill Filed 11/07/2014
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; supplemental; funding for part-time, independent student grants; restore. Amends 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1601 - 388.1896) by adding sec. 236e.
Title
Appropriations; supplemental; funding for part-time, independent student grants; restore. Amends 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1601 - 388.1896) by adding sec. 236e.
Sponsors
Sen. Samir Singh [D] | Rep. Adam Zemke [D] | Sen. Sean McCann [D] | Rep. Andrew Kandrevas [D] |
Rep. Pam Faris [D] | Rep. Dian Slavens [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lane [D] | Rep. Scott Dianda [D] |
Sen. Jeff Irwin [D] | Rep. Phil Cavanagh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-12 | House | Printed Bill Filed 11/07/2014 |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-11-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-11-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Sam Singh |
Same As/Similar To
SB1119 (Same As) 2014-10-22 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2014-HB-5901 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/House/htm/2014-HIB-5901.htm |