MI HB5988 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on December 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-15 - Assigned Pa 238'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on December 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-15 - Assigned Pa 238'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; other; incentives to invest in transit-oriented facilities and transit-oriented development; provide for. Amends sec. 1 of 1987 PA 231 (MCL 247.901).
Title
Economic development; other; incentives to invest in transit-oriented facilities and transit-oriented development; provide for. Amends sec. 1 of 1987 PA 231 (MCL 247.901).
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Byrnes [D] | Rep. Lesia Liss [D] | Rep. Matthew Lori [R] | Rep. Paul Opsommer [R] |
Sen. John Proos [R] | Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] | Rep. Sharon Tyler [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-11-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-15 | Assigned Pa 238'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-15 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2010 @ 1:28 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Approved By The Governor 12/14/2010 @ 11:06 Am | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To The Governor 12/9/2010 @ 1:16 Pm | |
2010-12-02 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-02 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-02 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 584 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-12-01 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-11-09 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-11-09 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-11-09 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-09-28 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism | |
2010-09-23 | Transmitted | |
2010-09-23 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 410 Yeas 84 Nays 20 | |
2010-09-23 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-09-23 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-09-23 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-09-23 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-06-29 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-06-29 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-03-25 | Printed Bill Filed 03/25/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Referred To Committee On Intergovernmental And Regional Affairs | |
2010-03-24 | Read A First Time | |
2010-03-24 | Introduced By Representative Wayne Schmidt |