MI HB5989 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-15 - Assigned Pa 239'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-15 - Assigned Pa 239'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; local development financing; incentives to invest in transit-oriented facilities and transit-oriented development; provide for. Amends sec. 2 of 1986 PA 281 (MCL 125.2152).
Title
Economic development; local development financing; incentives to invest in transit-oriented facilities and transit-oriented development; provide for. Amends sec. 2 of 1986 PA 281 (MCL 125.2152).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-15 | Assigned Pa 239'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-15 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2010 @ 1:30 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Approved By The Governor 12/14/2010 @ 11:08 Am | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2010 @ 1:40 Pm | |
2010-12-02 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-02 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-02 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 585 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-12-01 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-11-09 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-11-09 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-11-09 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-09-28 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism | |
2010-09-23 | Transmitted | |
2010-09-23 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 412 Yeas 80 Nays 24 | |
2010-09-23 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-09-23 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-09-23 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-09-23 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-06-29 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-06-29 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-03-25 | Printed Bill Filed 03/25/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Referred To Committee On Intergovernmental And Regional Affairs | |
2010-03-24 | Read A First Time | |
2010-03-24 | Introduced By Representative Gail Haines |