MI HB6006 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 638'18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 638'18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Legislature; legislative agencies; Michigan capitol committee; eliminate. Amends title of 1986 PA 268 (MCL 4.1101 - 4.1901) & repeals ch. 7 of 1986 PA 268 (MCL 4.1701 - 4.1702).
Title
Legislature; legislative agencies; Michigan capitol committee; eliminate. Amends title of 1986 PA 268 (MCL 4.1101 - 4.1901) & repeals ch. 7 of 1986 PA 268 (MCL 4.1701 - 4.1702).
Sponsors
Rep. James Lower [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 1043 (Y: 59 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 1059 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 388 (Y: 62 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 1059 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 388 (Y: 62 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 638'18 |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 6:28 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 4:55 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 3:56 Pm |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-21 | House | Roll Call # 1043 Yeas 59 Nays 43 |
2018-12-21 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Full Title |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 1059 Yeas 28 Nays 8 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2018-05-23 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 388 Yeas 62 Nays 47 |
2018-05-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-05-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/15/2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2018-05-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-15 | House | Introduced By Representative James Lower |