MI HB6053 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Printed Bill Filed 11/29/2012
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Printed Bill Filed 11/29/2012
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; other; eligible manufacturing personal property abatement for technology parks; extend. Amends 1984 PA 385 (MCL 207.701 - 207.718) by adding sec. 12a.
Title
Economic development; other; eligible manufacturing personal property abatement for technology parks; extend. Amends 1984 PA 385 (MCL 207.701 - 207.718) by adding sec. 12a.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Printed Bill Filed 11/29/2012 |
2012-11-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2012-11-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Frank Foster |
Same As/Similar To
SB1066 (Same As) 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0398'12
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2012-HB-6053 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2012-HIB-6053.htm |