MI HB6086 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel; examinations for certain emergency medical services personnel; modify, and require certain notices from education program sponsors. Amends secs. 20904, 20912, 20950, 20952 & 20954 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20904 et seq.).
Title
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel; examinations for certain emergency medical services personnel; modify, and require certain notices from education program sponsors. Amends secs. 20904, 20912, 20950, 20952 & 20954 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20904 et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] | Rep. Terry Sabo [D] | Rep. Sara Cambensy [D] | Rep. Gregory Markkanen [R] |
Rep. Kelly Breen [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 391 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2022-09-21 | House | Transmitted |
2022-09-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 391 Yeas 102 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-05-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-05-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-05-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/05/2022 |
2022-05-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Workforce, Trades, And Talent |
2022-05-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-05-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Yaroch |
Subjects
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel
State agencies (existing): health and human services
State agencies (existing): health and human services