MI HB6115 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-11 - Referred To Committee On Insurance
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-11 - Referred To Committee On Insurance
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; life; certain reporting requirements in associated life policies; eliminate. Amends sec. 2080 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.2080).
Title
Insurance; life; certain reporting requirements in associated life policies; eliminate. Amends sec. 2080 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.2080).
Sponsors
Sen. Lana Theis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 747 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2018-12-06 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 747 Yeas 106 Nays 3 |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-11-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-06-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/06/2018 |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2018-06-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Lana Theis |
Subjects
Cemeteries and funerals: prepaid contracts
Insurance: life
Insurance: unfair trade practices
State agencies (existing): insurance and financial services
Insurance: life
Insurance: unfair trade practices
State agencies (existing): insurance and financial services