MI HB6245 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-03 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-03 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Housing; housing development authority; disclosure of certain information by MSHDA; prohibit. Amends sec. 15a of 1966 PA 346 (MCL 125.1415a) & adds sec. 18.
Title
Housing; housing development authority; disclosure of certain information by MSHDA; prohibit. Amends sec. 15a of 1966 PA 346 (MCL 125.1415a) & adds sec. 18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-03 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-12-03 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-03 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-09-07 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism | |
2010-08-24 | Transmitted | |
2010-08-24 | Title Amended | |
2010-08-24 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 365 Yeas 85 Nays 14 | |
2010-08-24 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-08-24 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-08-24 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-08-24 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2010-08-24 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-06-30 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2010-06-10 | Printed Bill Filed 06/10/2010 | |
2010-06-09 | Referred To Committee On New Economy And Quality Of Life | |
2010-06-09 | Read A First Time | |
2010-06-09 | Introduced By Representative Ed Clemente |