MI HB6251 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-02 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-02 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; downtown development authorities; refinancing of certain qualified refunding obligations; allow. Amends sec. 1 of 1975 PA 197 (MCL 125.1651).
Title
Economic development; downtown development authorities; refinancing of certain qualified refunding obligations; allow. Amends sec. 1 of 1975 PA 197 (MCL 125.1651).
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Hammel [D] | Rep. Michael Lahti [D] | Rep. Steven Lindberg [D] | Rep. Gary McDowell [D] |
Rep. Judy Nerat [D] | Rep. Andy Neumann [D] | Rep. Alma Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-02 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-12-02 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-02 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-11-30 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism | |
2010-11-10 | Transmitted | |
2010-11-10 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 471 Yeas 89 Nays 10 | |
2010-11-10 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-11-10 | Amended | |
2010-11-10 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-11-09 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-11-09 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-06-10 | Printed Bill Filed 06/10/2010 | |
2010-06-09 | Referred To Committee On Intergovernmental And Regional Affairs | |
2010-06-09 | Read A First Time | |
2010-06-09 | Introduced By Representative Michael Lahti |