MI HB6499 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Land use; zoning and growth management; definition of state licensed residential facility; increase number of children receiving care at certain child caring institutions. Amends sec. 102 of 2006 PA 110 (MCL 125.3102).
Title
Land use; zoning and growth management; definition of state licensed residential facility; increase number of children receiving care at certain child caring institutions. Amends sec. 102 of 2006 PA 110 (MCL 125.3102).
Sponsors
Rep. John Reilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 956 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 771 (Y: 96 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 771 (Y: 96 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 5:42 Pm |
2018-12-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 956 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2018-12-06 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 771 Yeas 96 Nays 13 |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-06 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-11-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/27/2018 |
2018-11-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2018-11-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-27 | House | Introduced By Representative John Reilly |