MI HB6510 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; fraud; value thresholds for crime of false pretenses; revise. Amends sec. 218 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.218).
Title
Crimes; fraud; value thresholds for crime of false pretenses; revise. Amends sec. 218 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.218).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-10 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-11-10 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-10-06 | Printed Bill Filed 09/30/2010 | |
2010-09-29 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2010-09-29 | Read A First Time | |
2010-09-29 | Introduced By Representative David Nathan |
Same As/Similar To
SB1516 (Same As) 2010-09-28 - Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2010-HB-6510 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2009-2010/billintroduced/House/htm/2010-HIB-6510.htm |