MI HB6521 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for forgery and uttering and publishing of real estate instruments; enact. Amends sec. 16n, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16n). TIE BAR WITH: HB 6520'10
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for forgery and uttering and publishing of real estate instruments; enact. Amends sec. 16n, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16n). TIE BAR WITH: HB 6520'10
Sponsors
Rep. Douglas Geiss [D] | Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Rep. David Nathan [D] | Rep. Alma Smith [D] |
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D] | Sen. Rebekah Warren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-10 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-11-10 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-10-06 | Printed Bill Filed 09/30/2010 | |
2010-09-29 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2010-09-29 | Read A First Time | |
2010-09-29 | Introduced By Representative Rebekah Warren |
Same As/Similar To
SB1521 (Same As) 2010-09-28 - Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions
Subjects
Crimes, forgery
Crimes, uttering and publishing
Criminal procedure, sentencing guidelines
Property, other
Crimes, uttering and publishing
Criminal procedure, sentencing guidelines
Property, other
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2010-HB-6521 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2009-2010/billintroduced/House/htm/2010-HIB-6521.htm |