MI HB6531 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Labor; public service employment; calculation and allocation of medical benefit plan payments; subject to bargaining. Amends secs. 3 & 4 of 2011 PA 152 (MCL 15.563 & 15.564) & adds sec. 7a.
Title
Labor; public service employment; calculation and allocation of medical benefit plan payments; subject to bargaining. Amends secs. 3 & 4 of 2011 PA 152 (MCL 15.563 & 15.564) & adds sec. 7a.
Sponsors
Rep. James Lower [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-11-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/27/2018 |
2018-11-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2018-11-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-27 | House | Introduced By Representative James Lower |
Subjects
Insurance: health benefits
Labor: collective bargaining
Labor: health and safety
Labor: public service employment
Public employees and officers: compensation and benefits
Labor: collective bargaining
Labor: health and safety
Labor: public service employment
Public employees and officers: compensation and benefits