MI HB6541 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-13 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-13 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; spirits; discounts and refunds for spirits sold by a specially designated distributor; allow. Amends 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 609d.
Title
Liquor; spirits; discounts and refunds for spirits sold by a specially designated distributor; allow. Amends 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 609d.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 761 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 761 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-12-06 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 761 Yeas 102 Nays 6 |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-11-29 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/28/2018 |
2018-11-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-11-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |