MI HB6560 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-11 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment
Pending: Senate Economic Development And International Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-11 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment
Pending: Senate Economic Development And International Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; brownfield redevelopment authority; reimbursement formula for tax increment revenues lost as a result of certain personal property tax exemptions; modify. Amends sec. 15a of 1996 PA 381 (MCL 125.2665a).
Title
Economic development; brownfield redevelopment authority; reimbursement formula for tax increment revenues lost as a result of certain personal property tax exemptions; modify. Amends sec. 15a of 1996 PA 381 (MCL 125.2665a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 758 (Y: 90 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment |
2018-12-06 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 758 Yeas 90 Nays 19 |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-12-04 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/29/2018 |
2018-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2018-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-29 | House | Introduced By Representative David Maturen |
Subjects
Economic development: brownfield redevelopment authority
Economic development: tax increment financing
Economic development: tax increment financing