MI HB6572 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 521'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 521'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Labor; fair employment practices; certain information related to employment records of a law enforcement employee; modify employer release. Amends secs. 7 & 9 of 1978 PA 397 (MCL 423.507 & 423.509).
Title
Labor; fair employment practices; certain information related to employment records of a law enforcement employee; modify employer release. Amends secs. 7 & 9 of 1978 PA 397 (MCL 423.507 & 423.509).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 884 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 789 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 789 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 521'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 1:52 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 4:05 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 6:36 Pm |
2018-12-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 884 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-12-12 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 789 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-12-05 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 12/04/2018 |
2018-12-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-12-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Runestad |