MI HCR0041 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-30 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-30 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to memorialize the Congress of the United States to enact the federal Food Desert Oasis Act to encourage the location of grocery stores in certain communities.
Title
A concurrent resolution to memorialize the Congress of the United States to enact the federal Food Desert Oasis Act to encourage the location of grocery stores in certain communities.
Sponsors
Sen. Deborah Cherry [D] | Sen. Hansen Clarke [D] | Sen. Mark Jansen [R] | Sen. Bertram Johnson [D] |
Sen. Michael Switalski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-30 | Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record | |
2010-11-30 | Adopted | |
2010-06-08 | Placed On Order Of Resolutions | |
2010-06-08 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-03-10 | Referred To Committee On Local, Urban And State Affairs | |
2010-03-10 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-03-09 | Adopted And Transmitted | |
2010-03-02 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-02-10 | Referred To Committee On Urban Policy | |
2010-02-10 | Introduced By Representative Bert Johnson |