MI SB0024 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 17 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-31 - Pocket Veto 01/05/2010 2009 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 17 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-31 - Pocket Veto 01/05/2010 2009 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; judicial; incorrect nominating petition signature information provided to a candidate for the office of judge of the municipal court of record; provide equitable relief under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 426d of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.426d).
Title
Elections; judicial; incorrect nominating petition signature information provided to a candidate for the office of judge of the municipal court of record; provide equitable relief under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 426d of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.426d).
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Stamas [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-31 | Pocket Veto 01/05/2010 2009 Addenda | |
2009-12-30 | Presented To Governor 12/22/2009 @ 3:26 Pm | |
2009-12-17 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2009-12-17 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2009-12-17 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2009-12-17 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2009-12-17 | Returned To Senate | |
2009-12-17 | Inserted Full Title | |
2009-12-17 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 657 Yeas 104 Nays 0 | |
2009-12-17 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-12-17 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-12-17 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-12-17 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-12-02 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-12-02 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-03-04 | Referred To Committee On Ethics And Elections | |
2009-03-04 | Read A First Time | |
2009-03-04 | Received On 03/04/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Passed Roll Call # 33 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-03-04 | Amendment(s) Adopted | |
2009-03-03 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-03-03 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2009-03-03 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-02-18 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2009-02-18 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-02-18 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2009-01-27 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |