MI SB0024 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-24 - Assigned Pa 0075'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-24 - Assigned Pa 0075'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; other; payment of commissions or rebates to certain producers; permit. Amends sec. 1505 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1505).
Title
Insurance; other; payment of commissions or rebates to certain producers; permit. Amends sec. 1505 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1505).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 250 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 224 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 224 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-24 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0075'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-08-24 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/12/2011 @ 4:00 Pm |
2011-08-24 | Senate | Approved By Governor 7/12/2011 @ 10:13 Am |
2011-07-13 | Senate | Presented To Governor 7/6/2011 @ 2:26 Pm |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2011-06-29 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2011-06-29 | House | Returned To Senate |
2011-06-29 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2011-06-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 250 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2011-06-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-06-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-06-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-06-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-06-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-05-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2011-05-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-05-24 | House | Received On 05/24/2011 |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 224 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |