MI SB0048 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-12 - Assigned Pa 0088'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-12 - Assigned Pa 0088'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; portion of I-94 in Berrien County; designate as the "Kevin D. White Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2091) by adding sec. 110.
Title
Highways: memorial; portion of I-94 in Berrien County; designate as the "Kevin D. White Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2091) by adding sec. 110.
Sponsors
Sen. Kimberly LaSata [R] | Sen. Roger Victory [R] | Sen. Lana Theis [R] | Sen. Ruth Johnson [R] |
Sen. Aric Nesbitt [R] | Sen. Kevin Daley [R] | Sen. Michael MacDonald [R] | Rep. Curtis VanderWall [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 437 (Y: 101 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 118 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 118 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-12 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0088'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/07/2021 02:48 Pm |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/07/2021 02:00 Pm |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 09/28/2021 09:12 Am |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2021-09-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2021-09-14 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2021-09-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 437 Yeas 101 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2021-09-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-09-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-09-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-09-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2021-05-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-05 | House | Received On 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 118 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kimberly A. Lasata |