MI SB0077 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 18 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-30 - Pocket Veto 01/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Health facilities: nursing homes; electronic monitoring devices in nursing homes; allow under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 20199, 21702 & 21703 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20199 et seq.) & adds secs. 21788, 21788a, 21788b, 21788c, 21788d, 21788e, 21788f, 21788g & 21788i.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health facilities: nursing homes; electronic monitoring devices in nursing homes; allow under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 20199, 21702 & 21703 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20199 et seq.) & adds secs. 21788, 21788a, 21788b, 21788c, 21788d, 21788e, 21788f, 21788g & 21788i.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 612 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 609 (Y: 64 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 391 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-30SenatePocket Veto 01/05/2021
2020-12-23SenatePresented To Governor 12/22/2020 11:46 Am
2020-12-18SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-12-18SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2020-12-18SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2020-12-18SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 612 Yeas 22 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-12-18SenateHouse Substitute (h-5) Concurred In
2020-12-17HouseReturned To Senate
2020-12-17HouseTitle Amended
2020-12-17HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 609 Yeas 64 Nays 41 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
2020-12-17HouseRead A Third Time
2020-12-17HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-12-17HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-12-17HouseSubstitute (h-5) Adopted
2020-12-17HouseRead A Second Time
2020-12-16HousePlaced On Second Reading
2020-12-16HouseMotion To Discharge Committee Approved
2020-12-16HouseRule Suspended
2020-10-06HousePer Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
2020-10-01HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2020-10-01HouseRead A First Time
2020-10-01HouseReceived On 10/01/2020
2020-10-01SenatePassed Roll Call # 391 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-09-30SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3)
2020-09-30SenateSubstitute (s-3) Concurred In
2020-09-30SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3)
2020-06-16SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
2020-06-16SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-06-16SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2019-01-29SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced By Senator Jim Runestad

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0077
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0077.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0077.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0077.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0077.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-06-16-053.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-10-01-076.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-12-17-100.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-12-18-097.htm

Bill Comments

feedback