MI SB0081 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0477'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0477'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Education; school districts; limitations on certain uses of school district funds; provide for. Amends secs. 1254 & 1814 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1254 & 380.1814). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0080'13
Title
Education; school districts; limitations on certain uses of school district funds; provide for. Amends secs. 1254 & 1814 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1254 & 380.1814). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0080'13
Sponsors
Sen. Goeff Hansen [R] | Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. David Robertson [R] | Sen. Michael Green [R] |
Sen. James Marleau [R] | Sen. Howard Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 927 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 796 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 380 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 796 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 380 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0477'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/12/2015 @ 3:50 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/10/2015 @ 1:34 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 11:06 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-19 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 927 Yeas 34 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-19 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-19 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 796 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2014-12-19 | House | Amended |
2014-12-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-10-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2013-10-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-10-01 | House | Received On 10/01/2013 |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 380 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Goeffrey Hansen |