MI SB0102 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-01 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-01 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; public school employees; defined contribution only for employees hired after certain date; provide for. Amends secs. 5, 81d & 132 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1305 et seq.) & adds sec. 133.
Title
Retirement; public school employees; defined contribution only for employees hired after certain date; provide for. Amends secs. 5, 81d & 132 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1305 et seq.) & adds sec. 133.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-4 (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-4 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-4 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Phillip Pavlov |
Same As/Similar To
HB5218 (Same As) 2016-01-14 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/13/2016