MI SB0150 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-18 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-18 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax: tax tribunal; methods for tax tribunal to hold small claims hearings; expand to include telephonically or by videoconferencing. Amends sec. 62 of 1973 PA 186 (MCL 205.762).
Title
Property tax: tax tribunal; methods for tax tribunal to hold small claims hearings; expand to include telephonically or by videoconferencing. Amends sec. 62 of 1973 PA 186 (MCL 205.762).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 316 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 316 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2023-05-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-05-23 | House | Received On 05/23/2023 |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 316 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Stephanie Chang |