MI SB0194 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-01 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-01 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of returning nonreturnable containers; enact. Amends sec. 14h, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.14h).
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of returning nonreturnable containers; enact. Amends sec. 14h, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.14h).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-01 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-07 | Referred To Committee On Great Lakes And Environment | |
2009-05-07 | Read A First Time | |
2009-05-07 | Received On 05/07/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Passed Roll Call # 165 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-04-30 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2009-04-30 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-04-30 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2009-02-05 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |