MI SB0257 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 11:06 Am 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 11:06 Am 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; other; business improvement districts; modify. Amends secs. 10, 10a, 10b, 10c, 10e, 10f, 10g, 10h, 10i, 10k & 10l of 1961 PA 120 (MCL 125.990 et seq.); adds sec. 10n & repeals sec. 10d of 1961 PA 120 (MCL 125.990d).
Title
Economic development; other; business improvement districts; modify. Amends secs. 10, 10a, 10b, 10c, 10e, 10f, 10g, 10h, 10i, 10k & 10l of 1961 PA 120 (MCL 125.990 et seq.); adds sec. 10n & repeals sec. 10d of 1961 PA 120 (MCL 125.990d).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 356 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-09-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 356 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 284 (Y: 77 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 74 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 356 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 284 (Y: 77 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 74 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 11:06 Am 2014 Addenda |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0126'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/9/2013 @ 9:52 Am |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/8/2013 @ 4:56 Pm |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Presented To Governor 9/25/2013 @ 2:40 Pm |
2013-09-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-09-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2013-09-18 | Senate | Roll Call # 356 Yeas 31 Nays 4 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2013-09-18 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2013-09-17 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2013-09-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2013-09-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 284 Yeas 77 Nays 31 |
2013-09-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-09-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2013-09-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-09-12 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2013-09-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2013-04-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-04-11 | House | Received On 04/11/2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 74 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael Kowall |